+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.374
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.62
- Substituted For A6653
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.394
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor