+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a5499
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.872
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: present
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: present
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor