+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.193
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.362
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
April 22, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1