+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4551a
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1097
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor