+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.227
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.652
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor