+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4533d
- Amend (t) and recommit to energy and telecommunications
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4533c
- Amend and recommit to energy and telecommunications
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4533b
- Amend and recommit to finance
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4533a
- Amend and recommit to energy and telecommunications
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - May 28, 2014
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea