+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4522a
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1491
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor