+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4520b
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4520a
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.141
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1306
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor