+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.494
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1366
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
March 28, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor