+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.373
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4511c
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4511b
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1302
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4511a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
February 6, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11
May 31, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor