+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.240
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Vote
March 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor