+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.382
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.119
- Substituted For A6800
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.569
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Social Services)
- Yeas: 7