+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Insurance
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4488a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Insurance
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor