+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.138
- Signed Chap.783
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.94
- Substituted For A528a
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4478a
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.380
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor