+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.349
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.318
- Substituted For A5094
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1335
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 26, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor