+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.240
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.636
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 11
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
March 31, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 12
March 23, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor