+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4444c
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.88
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1887
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4444b
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4444a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 19
June 25, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1