+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 444b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 444a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor