+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4403b
- Amend and recommit to transportation
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to transportation
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
- Committed to rules
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 4403a
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.512
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Vote
April 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Transportation - Apr 30, 2013
- Yeas: 18
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor