+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.73
- Signed Chap.751
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.323
- Substituted For A1178
On January 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.138
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor