+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.702
- Approval Memo.61
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.581
- Substituted For A445a
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Amended On Third Reading 439a
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.594
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 23
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor