+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1327
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4377a
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.656
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor