+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4375a
- Amend and recommit to health
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
+ − Vote
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Health - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 17
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Catharine Young: yea