+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.491
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor