+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.543
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.541
- Substituted For A6128
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.833
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor