+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.96
On December 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.530
- Substituted For A6150b
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 4371d
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1039
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 4371c
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.340
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4371b
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 4371a
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 15
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 24, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 14
February 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor