+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a6567
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.70
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On March 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Vote
January 28, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Jan 28, 2014
- Yeas: 10
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea