+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.402
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.321
- Substituted For A5370a
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1062
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 9
May 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor