+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a7213a
- Ordered to third reading cal.1527
- Substituted by a7213a
- Ordered to third reading cal.1527
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 4366a
- Amend and recommit to finance
- Reported and committed to finance
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to banks
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 20, 2013
- Yeas: 25
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
June 5, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Banks - Jun 5, 2013
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor