+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.552
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor