+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A2370b
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.395
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4338a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.613
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor