+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.421
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
February 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor