+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.708
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.548
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 6
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor