+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.43
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.129
- Substituted For A6245a
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.612
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor