+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Lost
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.114
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1173
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19