+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.538
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4277a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 12
April 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor