+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.218
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.417
- Substituted For A5425
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.759
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor