+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1363
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1313
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities)
- Yeas: 11
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities)
- Yeas: 11