+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4246b
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4246a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor