+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1554
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1268
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4244a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor