+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.997
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1301
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor