+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a1093c
- Ordered to third reading cal.1602
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4235b
- Amend and recommit to finance
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 4235a
- Amend and recommit to insurance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to insurance
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to insurance
+ − Vote
June 19, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 19, 2014
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: present
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: present
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor