+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1171
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4185b
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1707
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4185a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (6)
June 2, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor