+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.738
- Approval Memo.84
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.360
- Substituted For A5957a
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 4173a
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.387
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7