+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.403
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.494
- Substituted For A6468
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.386
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor