+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.415
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.519
- Substituted For A4183a
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4125a
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.831
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor