+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.272
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.547
- Substituted For A10658
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1934
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4121a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9