+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4116b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 4116a
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.265
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
March 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor