+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A6333
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.977
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
May 10, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 11