+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.939
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor